Global Patent Index - EP 1076772 A1

EP 1076772 A1 2001-02-21 - FUEL INJECTION NOZZLE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION NOZZLE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZDÜSE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1076772 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924908 A

Priority

  • DE 19820513 A
  • EP 9903160 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19820513A1] The nozzle is used in a common rail injection system and has a needle (11) moved by an actuating device. The needle has a sharp tip (121) extending into a small chamber (110) from which the fuel flows through spray nozzle passages (120). Fuel from the supply flows into a conical portion of the nozzle with a first taper angle (alpha1) of 60 degrees. The needle has a conical portion leading into a portion with a gentle taper (alpha3) of 30-40 degrees followed by a more sharply tapered portion (alpha2) of 58.5 degrees which seals against the tapered bore of the nozzle. There is a groove (19) in the tip, immediately downstream of the sealing portion, facing a matching groove (18) in the bore of the nozzle. A tapering annular chamber (17) leads into the tip chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/1873 (2013.01); F02M 61/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9958844A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19820513 A1 19991111; EP 1076772 A1 20010221; EP 1076772 B1 20021002; US 6427932 B1 20020806; WO 9958844 A1 19991118

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040507

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-05-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030514

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-05-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030512

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030428

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902943 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT