Global patent index - EP 1076870 A1

EP 1076870 A1 2001-02-21 - PERFORMANCE EVALUATION TOOL AND METHOD

Title (en)

PERFORMANCE EVALUATION TOOL AND METHOD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR LEISTUNGSAUSWERTUNG

Title (fr)

OUTIL ET PROCEDE D'EVALUATION DE PERFORMANCES

Publication

EP 1076870 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99921812 A

Priority

  • US 9910143 W
  • US 8479498 P
  • US 11010898 A
  • US 11010998 A
  • US 11010398 A
  • US 11010798 A
  • US 11010698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959093A1] An organizational structure of an enterprise is defined in a performance evaluation system by storing a plurality of user-defined levels. A user-defined hierarchy is stored for the levels. A plurality of user-defined members are also stored. Each member is associated with a level. The performance evaluation system is operable to generate the organizational structure of the enterprise based on the user-defined levels, hierarchy, and members. An evaluation is generated in a performance evaluation system by defining a plurality of questions. A plurality of performance areas are defined and each associated with at least one of the questions. Access privileges for a user are provided in a performance evaluation system by storing an organizational structure for an enterprise, a view and a class of services for the user. A data file is imported into the performance evaluation system by storing a plurality of user-defined data elements. A user-defined configuration is stored for the data file. Results are generated in a performance evaluation system by storing a user-defined filter specifying performance criteria for a result.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959093 A1 19991118; AU 3892499 A 19991129; AU 765187 B2 20030911; CA 2331188 A1 19991118; EP 1076870 A1 20010221

INPADOC legal status

2014-09-04 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G06F0017600000

- IPC: G06Q0050000000

- Effective date: 20140724

2014-06-25 [R18R] REFUSED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R18R

- Effective date: 20140224

2014-04-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20140210

2014-02-10 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R003

2005-03-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETALK CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050119

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE