Global Patent Index - EP 1076917 A1

EP 1076917 A1 2001-02-21 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR

Title (en)

PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR

Title (de)

PIEZOELEKTRISCHER AKTOR

Title (fr)

ACTIONNEUR PIEZOELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1076917 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907428 A

Priority

  • DE 0000121 W
  • DE 19909452 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19909452C1] A piezoelectric actuator (10), designed as a multilayered laminate, consists of layers of piezoelectric material (11) and metallic, conductive electric layers in between (12,13) serving as electrodes contacted alternately through common electrode paths (14,15) on the actuator casing sides and connected with these paths to supply connectors (16,17) for supplying operating voltage to the actuator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 41/047; F02M 51/06; H01L 41/083

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); H01L 41/047 (2006.01); H01L 41/083 (2006.01); H02N 2/04 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 41/083 (2013.01); F02M 51/005 (2013.01); F02M 51/0603 (2013.01); H01L 41/0475 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0052769A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19909452 C1 20000323; EP 1076917 A1 20010221; JP 2002538628 A 20021112; US 6414418 B1 20020702; WO 0052769 A1 20000908

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080531

2007-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071120

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010308

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE