Global Patent Index - EP 1076972 A1

EP 1076972 A1 2001-02-21 - SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING AN OBJECT USING A "WEB" BROWSER CO-OPERATING WITH A SMART CARD

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR ACCESSING AN OBJECT USING A "WEB" BROWSER CO-OPERATING WITH A SMART CARD

Title (de)

SYSTEM FÜR OBJEKTZUGANG MIT WEB BROWSER UND ZUSAMMENWIRKENDE CHIPKARTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEMD D'ACCES A UN OBJET A L'AIDE D'UN NAVIGATEUR DE TYPE "WEB" COOPERANT AVEC UNE CARTE A PUCE

Publication

EP 1076972 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00910949 A

Priority

  • FR 0000625 W
  • FR 9903172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2791159A1] The invention concerns an architecture for securely accessing virtual objects (Obv?i?) distributed in systems connected to the Internet (RI), and for obtaining an instance therefrom. Said access is performed, via a smart card (2a), through a "WEB" browser (10). The terminal (1) and the smart card (2a) comprise each a specific protocol layer (13, 23a). The latter contains intelligent agents (132, 232a1) for setting up two-way data exchange sessions, thereby enabling the smart card (2a) to have a "WEB" server functionality. The smart card (2a) also comprises intelligent agents, called script translators, and a virtual file management system (8) co-operating with a specialised script translator intelligent agent (7). Each virtual object (Obv?i? )is associated with a virtual file of the virtual file management system (8). The specialised intelligent agent (7) presents to the browser (10) the list of accessible virtual objects (Obv?i?) and generates methods for accessing said objects.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 29/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 19/00 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01); H04L 29/06 (2006.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 20/105 (2013.01); H04L 29/06 (2013.01); H04L 29/08846 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01); H04L 67/2842 (2013.01); H04L 67/289 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0056030A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2791159 A1 20000922; FR 2791159 B1 20010504; AU 3298200 A 20001004; AU 776016 B2 20040826; AU 776016 C 20050324; CA 2332283 A1 20000921; CA 2332283 C 20110308; CN 100385889 C 20080430; CN 1300494 A 20010620; EP 1076972 A1 20010221; HK 1036539 A1 20090424; JP 2002539546 A 20021119; JP 2006134335 A 20060525; JP 3794926 B2 20060712; US 6944650 B1 20050913; WO 0056030 A1 20000921

INPADOC legal status


2015-03-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20141001

2006-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060811

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CP8 TECHNOLOGIES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE