Global Patent Index - EP 1077014 A1

EP 1077014 A1 2001-02-21 - FLAT ACOUSTIC PANEL with driver

Title (en)

FLAT ACOUSTIC PANEL with driver

Title (de)

FLACHES KLANGPANEEL mit Treiber

Title (fr)

PANNEAU ACOUSTIQUE PLAT avec son vibreur

Publication

EP 1077014 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99923592 A

Priority

  • DE 19821860 A
  • EP 9903305 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821860A1] The driver includes a voice coil holder (17) on which a coil (16) is fixed. The coil holder is connected in an air gap (18) to a permanent magnet (15) and/or a closure arrangement (14) via an elastic diaphragm (23). The coil holder may be pot-shaped, with its base (17) connected to the flat panel (11). The base (17) itself or an intermediate plate (19) may be formed as a piezoelectric bending wave plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 9/06; H04R 7/10; H04R 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 7/04 (2006.01); H04R 7/10 (2006.01); H04R 9/04 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01); H04R 17/00 (2006.01); H04R 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/066 (2013.01); H04R 7/10 (2013.01); H04R 9/045 (2013.01); H04R 17/00 (2013.01); H04R 7/045 (2013.01); H04R 31/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960820A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821860 A1 19991118; DE 59914445 D1 20070920; EP 1077014 A1 20010221; EP 1077014 B1 20070808; US 6347149 B1 20020212; WO 9960820 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080509

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071108

2008-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070808

2007-12-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914445

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-09-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2007-08-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H04R 7/04 20060101AFI20070111BHEP

2007-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H04R 9/06 20060101ALI20070111BHEP

2007-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H04R 7/10 20060101ALI20070111BHEP

2007-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H04R 17/00 20060101ALI20070111BHEP

2007-02-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: FLAT ACOUSTIC PANEL WITH DRIVER

2006-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20060712

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000822

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE