Global Patent Index - EP 1077035 A1

EP 1077035 A1 2001-02-21 - Deflection device for a mass flow

Title (en)

Deflection device for a mass flow

Title (de)

Umlenkung für einen Massenstrom

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déviation pour un courant en plusieurs couches

Publication

EP 1077035 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110855 A

Priority

DE 19938542 A

Abstract (en)

The deflection (1) is bordered at least partly by a breathing cover (8) so that the flowing material in the area of the deflection can alter in volume. the cover has at least two movable flaps (10,12) forming the cover or are swivel mounted on the exterior of the deflection. One of the two flaps is mounted at the start of the deflection, and the other flap is mounted at the end of the deflection.

Abstract (de)

Umlenkung (1) für einen Massenstrom aus von einer Fördereinrichtung geförderten stabförmigen Gegenständen der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie, wobei die Umlenkung mindestens teilweise von einer atmenden Abdeckung (8) begrenzt ist, um dem Massenstrom im Bereich der Umlenkung ein veränderliches Volumen zur Verfügung zu stellen, wobei die Abdeckung mindestens zwei bewegliche Klappen (10,12) aufweist. Die Erfindung zeichnet sich dadurch aus, daß die Klappen selbst im wesentlichen die Abdeckung bilden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/35

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 11/00 (2006.01); A24C 5/35 (2006.01); B65G 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/35 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

US 4073374 A 19780214 - HINCHCLIFFE DENNIS, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077035 A1 20010221; CN 1176839 C 20041124; CN 1285309 A 20010228; DE 19938542 A1 20010222; JP 2001088918 A 20010403; PL 342050 A1 20010226; US 6390273 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051108

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041102

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI