Global patent index - EP 1077039 A2

EP 1077039 A2 2001-02-21 - Vending counter

Title (en)

Vending counter

Title (de)

Verkaufstheke

Title (fr)

Comptoir de vente

Publication

EP 1077039 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113741 A

Priority

DE 29914069 U

Abstract (en)

The transparent display area of the counter (1) is located at the top and has a bow-shaped front (5), which can be opened by being rotated around a horizontal axle (6). A U-profile (4), positioned along the plane worktop or serving area (3), is provided with a curved fitting (7), which can be guided around the front edge of the worktop (3) when the front cover (5) is opened. There is always a full view on the contents of the display area, while at the same time the gap (14) between the front cover and the front edge of the worktop (3) is kept extremely narrow.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung befaßt sich mit einer Verkaufstheke, deren kundenseitige Frontscheibe (5) schwenkbar gelagert ist und ein horizontales ortsfestes Ausgabeboard (3) aufweist. Die einander zugekehrten Ränder (12,13) der in Schließstellung befindlichen Frontscheibe (5) und des Ausgabeboardes (3) sind voneinander distanziert gehalten, wobei die Frontscheibe (5) von Ansätzen (8) gekrümmter Beschläge (7) gehalten ist und die Beschläge (7) um eine Achse (10) schwenkbar gelagert sowie federnd abgestützt sind. Um das Eindringen von Fremdpartikeln von außen her in den Warenraum weitgehend zu verhindern und dennoch eine optimale Transparenz der Scheiben für den Einblick auf die Ware zu erreichen, ragt der dem Ausgabeboard (3) zugekehrte Rand (13) der Frontscheibe (5) über den Ansatz (8) des gekrümmten Beschlages (7) frei hinweg und bildet in der Schließstellung einen nur minimalen unabgedeckten Spalt (14) gegenüber dem zugekehrten Rand (12) des Ausgabeboardes (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/04; A47F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/007 (2013.01); A47F 3/0434 (2013.01); A47F 2003/008 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/416 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/204 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914069 U1 20000629; EP 1077039 A2 20010221; EP 1077039 A3 20010829

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020302

2002-06-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI