Global Patent Index - EP 1077056 A3

EP 1077056 A3 2002-09-04 - Method and apparatus for preparing mixtures of pharmaceutical solutions

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for preparing mixtures of pharmaceutical solutions

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Gemischen pharmazeutischer Flüssigkeiten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour préparer des mixtures de solutions pharmaceutiques

Publication

EP 1077056 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00117752 A

Priority

DE 19939219 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1077056A2] The device has at least two reservoir containers, a housing with a vacuum chamber for accommodating the container (20) to be filled, which is connected to the reservoir vessels via connecting tubes (21) contg. dosing devices for the mixture components, a weighing device (8) with a suspended scale pan (15) for the container to be filled, deflection devices (18) for the tubes and a clamping device (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01); A61J 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/2093 (2013.01); A61J 3/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077056 A2 20010221; EP 1077056 A3 20020904; DE 19939219 A1 20010301; DE 19939219 C2 20011018

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CIEBLER, FRITZ

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STREHLE, THOMAS

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI