Global Patent Index - EP 1077074 A2

EP 1077074 A2 2001-02-21 - Nose filter and process for producing the same

Title (en)

Nose filter and process for producing the same

Title (de)

Nasenfilter und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Filtre nasal et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1077074 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00202857 A

Priority

DE 19938610 A

Abstract (en)

The nose filter consists of two filter housings(1,2) joined by a semicircular bridge piece (9). The top opening of the filter housing is preferably oval in shape and has an inwardly pointing rim holding a filter disc. The interior of the filter housing is smooth-surfaced and has a micro-roughened surface (5) on its outer part. The top end of the filter housing has lammelar incisions (10) in a lengthwise direction in relation to the axis of symmetry of the filter housing.

Abstract (de)

Der Nasenfilter ist dazu bestimmt, Personen, die verstärkt unter Allergien leiden, vor dem Einfluß des Pollenfluges, der Staubmilben oder Mikrosporen zu schützen. Denkbar ist sein Einsatz auch in Bereichen der Medizin oder Industrie (Chipherstellung). Die Filtergehäuse sind ergonomisch auf thermischem Wege weitgehendst den individuellen Gegebenheiten von Nasengang und Nasenscheidewand angepaßt und besitzen am oberen oder unteren Ende eine ovale Öffnung mit nach innen gerichtetem umlaufenden Rand, der eine aus Vlies bestehende Filterscheibe aufnimmt. Die Struktur der Filterscheibe erlaubt es (gesplittete Filterfasern, die von Deckvlies umhüllt sind) die "Raumwirkung" des Nasenfilters zu erhöhen, wodurch die Aufnahmefähigkeit verbessert und die Nutzungsdauer verlängert wird. Die Filtergehäuse werden untereinander mit einem halbkreisförmigen Steg fest verbunden und besitzen zur Unterstützung des Paßsitzes lamellenförmige Einschnitte oder konzentrisch angeordnete Riffelungen an ihrer Oberfläche. Die Filtergehäuse können entweder separat oder als Filtereinheit mit Steg auf dem Weg des Tiefziehens bzw. Spritzgießens hergestellt werden, wobei die Filterscheiben sofort oder später eingebracht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 23/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077074 A2 20010221; EP 1077074 A3 20010919; DE 19938610 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH FR GB LI NL

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020309

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAEUSCHER, KHANH PHUONG

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHULZE, HOLGER J.

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR GB LI NL

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI