Global Patent Index - EP 1077075 A2

EP 1077075 A2 2001-02-21 - Modular tetrahedral rings

Title (en)

Modular tetrahedral rings

Title (de)

Modulare, tetraedrische Ringe

Title (fr)

Anneaux tétraédriques modulaires

Publication

EP 1077075 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00306956 A

Priority

GB 9919351 A

Abstract (en)

Rings of tetrahedral bodies are described in which each body has two opposed edges hinged to edges of respective tetrahedral bodies adjacent in the ring. A body has two part-tetrahedral bodies separate or separable from other part-tetrahedral bodies with which respective tetrahedral bodies can be assembled. The two part-tetrahedral bodies are joined hingedly between edges corresponding to edges or part edges of the respective tetrahedral bodies. In constructing a ring from such bodies, joins need to be made only between parts which do not move relative to one another, the hinge being already provided. The body including the hinge may be conveniently moulded in one piece from a suitable plastics material. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63H 33/10 (2006.01); A63F 9/08 (2006.01); A63H 33/08 (2006.01); E04B 1/344 (2006.01); E04B 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/088 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077075 A2 20010221; EP 1077075 A3 20010912; GB 2353226 A 20010221; GB 9919351 D0 19991020; JP 2001087565 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI