Global Patent Index - EP 1077087 A1

EP 1077087 A1 2001-02-21 - Milling roller and method for its manufacturing

Title (en)

Milling roller and method for its manufacturing

Title (de)

Mahlwalze und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung

Title (fr)

Rouleau broyeur et procédé de fabrication correspondente

Publication

EP 1077087 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115889 A

Priority

  • DE 19938652 A
  • DE 10014836 A

Abstract (en)

The grinding roller has a rolling jacket (10) with wear-resistant surface reinforcement. Spaced indentations (11, 12) are formed in the outer surface of the jacket and prefabricated hard bodies (13,14) are inserted therein. Through corresponding rough surfaces hollow cavities are formed between the bottom of the indentations and the underneath of the hard bodies and the cavities are filled with an adhesive (17). The adhesive mass preferably incorporates hard metal splinters. The rolling jacket is made from a cast metal body.

Abstract (de)

Um insbesondere für die Mahlwalzen von Hochdruck-Walzenmühlen zur Druckzerkleinerung körnigen Gutes eine für den autogenen Verschleißschutz mit Anwendung der Rasterpanzerungstechnik geeignete Oberflächenpanzerung zu schaffen, die durch hohe Verschleiß- und Druckfestigkeit ein hohes Standzeitvermögen aufweist und die doch relativ einfach und insgesamt kostengünstig zu fertigen und zu reparieren ist, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, in die Außenoberfläche des Walzenmantels (10) voneinander beabstandete Vertiefungen (11, 12) einzuformen und in die Vertiefungen vorgefertigte hochverschleißfeste Hartkörper (13, 14) einzupressen, und zwar auf eine Klebemasse (17), welche den mit Hohlräumen ausgestatteten Raum zwischen dem Grund (15) der Vertiefungen und der Unterseite (16) der eingepassten Hartkörper (13, 14) ausfüllt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 4/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 4/305 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR

EPO simple patent family

US 6523767 B1 20030225; DK 1077087 T3 20030804; EP 1077087 A1 20010221; EP 1077087 B1 20030528

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002334

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110705

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-04-18 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2005-08-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2004-06-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040611

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040610

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002334 P 20030703

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020122

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK FR

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI