Global Patent Index - EP 1077094 A1

EP 1077094 A1 2001-02-21 - High pressure cleaning device

Title (en)

High pressure cleaning device

Title (de)

Hochdruckreinigungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de nettoyage haute pression

Publication

EP 1077094 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113889 A

Priority

DE 29914193 U

Abstract (en)

The cleaning appliance has a main housing in which there is a pump for the cleaning fluid. A hose winder is also provided on the side of the housing for winding a high pressure hose which carries the fluid. In the lower region of the winder drum (8) there is provided at least one seal element (18) connecting to the housing which lies directly on the side wall (10) of the wider. The seal element extends across the entire width of the drum.

Abstract (de)

Um bei einem Hochdruckreinigungsgerät (1) mit einem Gehäuse (2), in dem Fördermittel für eine unter hohem Druck über eine flexible Hochdruckleitung (11) abgegebene Reinigungsflüssigkeit angeordnet sind, und mit einer einen Wickelkern und über den Wickelkern (9) radial vorstehende Seitenwände (10) aufweisenden Schlauchtrommel (8) zum Aufwickeln der Hochdruckleitung, die am Gehäuse drehbar gelagert ist und zumindest mit ihrem unteren Teil in eine Aufnahmekammer (5) am Gehäuse eintaucht, ein problemfreies Auf- und Abwickeln der Hochdruckleitung auf der Schlauchtrommel zu ermöglichen, wird vorgeschlagen, daß im Bereich des unteren Teils der Schlauchtrommel mindestens ein Abschlußelement (18) unmittelbar an den Außenumfang (17) der Seitenwände (10) anschließend am Gehäuse fest angeordnet ist, das sich über die gesamte Breite der Schlauchtrommel erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02; B65H 75/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B65H 75/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/425 (2013.01); B08B 3/026 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914193 U1 19991021; DK 1077094 T3 20030224; EP 1077094 A1 20010221; EP 1077094 B1 20030122

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-03-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001130

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50001130

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130730

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130611

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALFRED KAERCHER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001130 P 20030227

2003-02-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020507

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE DK FR IT LI

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR IT LI

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI