Global Patent Index - EP 1077104 A8

EP 1077104 A8 2001-05-02 - Method of reconditioning a reusable barrel made of metal sheet

Title (en)

Method of reconditioning a reusable barrel made of metal sheet

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Rekonditionieren von Mehrwegfässern aus Metallblech

Title (fr)

Procédé de reconditionnement pour tonneau réutilisable en tôle metallique

Publication

EP 1077104 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 00116912 A

Priority

DE 19938597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2315584A1] In a method for reconditioning a returnable barrel of sheet metal, that is used initially as a bung barrel having a barrel wall and a top cover with a fill and discharge bung and fixedly connected to the barrel wall, and is to be reused as a lid barrel with a bung lid or bung-free lid connected to an outwardly rolled opening rim of the barrel wall via a clamping ring closure after removal of the top cover; wherein the barrel wall has an upper portion forming a barrel neck recessed or tapered relative to the outwardly rolled opening rim of the barrel wall, wherein the top cover of the initial bung barrel has a rolled outer rim placed on the outwardly rolled opening rim of the barrel wall and connected to the outwardly rolled opening rim by lock-seaming and welding, the top cover of the bung barrel is circularly cut concentrically to a longitudinal center axis of the barrel at a transition between a plate of the top cover and an upwardly extending inner rim of the top cover to separate the plate of the top cover from the barrel wall and leave a free lower portion of the upwardly extending inner rim. Subsequently, the lower portion of the upwardly extending inner rim is formed into an annular circumferential inner groove of the barrel neck.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23P 6/00; B21D 51/26; B23P 19/04; B65D 8/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/08 (2006.01); B21D 51/26 (2006.01); B23P 6/00 (2006.01); B23P 19/04 (2006.01); B65D 8/20 (2006.01); B65D 8/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 1/08 (2013.01); B23P 6/00 (2013.01); B23P 19/046 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49716 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49821 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077104 A2 20010221; EP 1077104 A3 20030129; EP 1077104 A8 20010502; EP 1077104 B1 20050223; AR 025106 A1 20021106; AT 289535 T 20050315; AU 5050600 A 20010215; AU 769746 B2 20040205; BR 0003560 A 20010403; BR 0003560 B1 20100406; CA 2315584 A1 20010214; CA 2315584 C 20051018; DE 19938597 A1 20010405; DE 19938597 C2 20010823; DE 50009574 D1 20050331; DK 1077104 T3 20050627; ES 2233248 T3 20050616; MX PA00007860 A 20041110; NO 20004024 A 20010215; NO 20004024 D0 20000810; NO 318060 B1 20050124; US 6453533 B1 20020924; ZA 200003908 B 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130806

2014-10-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20141014

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130902

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130805

2014-06-05 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009574

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140430

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130805

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100806

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100805

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100805

2011-03-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-28 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHUTZ G.M.B.H. & CO. KGAA

- Effective date: 20050831

2006-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-02-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051124

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-08-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-08-05 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050805

2005-08-03 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-06-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233248 T3

2005-06-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050523

2005-03-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009574 P 20050331

2005-03-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-03-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-02-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-02-23 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-02-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050223

2003-12-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031028

2003-10-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030616

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHUETZ GMBH & CO. KGAA

2001-04-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD OF RECONDITIONING A REUSABLE BARREL MADE OF METAL SHEET

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI