Global Patent Index - EP 1077114 A2

EP 1077114 A2 2001-02-21 - Magnetic strip assembly for use with socket-type tools and the like

Title (en)

Magnetic strip assembly for use with socket-type tools and the like

Title (de)

Magnetischer Steifen zur Benutzung mit steckschlüsselartigen Werkzeugen und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Bande aimanté pour utilisation avec des outil du type douille et equivalent

Publication

EP 1077114 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307112 A

Priority

US 37623099 A

Abstract (en)

A magnetic strip assembly for use with socket-type tools includes a flexible magnetized strip (12) which is releasably attached to a carrier member (14) with pressure sensitive adhesive. The strip is die-cut to form an array of lift-off inserts (20) in various sizes and shapes for selective removal and registered placement within a socket (28) of a drive-tool (26). The insert (20) magnetically holds a metal fastener (30), such as a nut or bolt, for initiating nut or bolt tightening and is especially adapted for applications in hard-to-reach areas. A core (22) of the insert is attachable to an end of a rod to magnetically retrieve small metal objects, such as washers, nuts and screws from similar locations. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077114 A2 20010221; EP 1077114 A3 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011214

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-06-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI