Global Patent Index - EP 1077178 A1

EP 1077178 A1 2001-02-21 - Adjustable doctor blade

Title (en)

Adjustable doctor blade

Title (de)

Einstellbarer Leimschaber

Title (fr)

Râcleur de colle réglable

Publication

EP 1077178 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114738 A

Priority

DE 19938878 A

Abstract (en)

The doctor blade (2) for the adhesive roller (12) of a labelling machine has a mounting (3) which biases it to ensure a minimum gap (10) from the roller. The gap can be varied by moving a slide (5) along an inclined plane (7) in the mounting.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen an eine Leimwalze anschwenkbaren, ein- oder mehrteiligen Leimschaber in einer Etikettiermaschine für Behälter, insbesondere Flaschen, dessen Teile mit einem Träger auf einer Welle verschwenkbar gelagert sind. Bei einem solchen Leimschaber sollen Vorkehrungen getroffen werden, die im Betrieb eine sichere Arbeitsweise und eine optimale Einstellung des Leimschabers zur Leimwalze zulassen. Hierzu wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Leimschaber-Abstand zur Leimwalze entlang einer schiefen Ebene, die vom Leimschaber entfernt angeordnet ist, einstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 9/2269 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

[DA] DE 4019409 A1 19911219 - ETI TEC MASCHINENBAU [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077178 A1 20010221; EP 1077178 B1 20040922; BR 0003629 A 20010724; DE 19938878 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Effective date: 20111122

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI