Global Patent Index - EP 1077193 A1

EP 1077193 A1 2001-02-21 - Device for dispensing a roll of single-sided adhesive tape

Title (en)

Device for dispensing a roll of single-sided adhesive tape

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zm Abrollen von auf einer Rolle befindlichem, einseitig selbstklebend ausgerüstetem Material

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la distribution d'un rouleau de matériau autocollant simple face

Publication

EP 1077193 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00115956 A

Priority

DE 29914317 U

Abstract (en)

A rotatably mounted spigot(21) for holding the roll(4) is installed on a holder(2) fitted on a handle piece(1). The roll has freedom of movement in the axial direction, and the holder is kept in position, especially by a spring(3), so that the roll located on the spigot is pressed against a guide roller(5) also fitted on the handle piece. The guide roller has guides(51) protruding at the sides. The material(41) is guided from the roll over the guide roller and onto a dispensing component(6) by means of which the material is placed on the base surface.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung (100) zum Abrollen von auf einer Rolle (4) befindlichem selbstklebend ausgerüstetem Material (41), bestehend aus einem Griffstück (1), einem an dem Griffstück (1) beweglich angebrachten Halter (2), wobei an dem Halter (2) ein drehbar gelagerter Drehzapfen (21) zur Aufnahme der Rolle (4) vorhanden ist, die Rolle (4) eine Bewegungsfreiheit in axialer Richtung aufweist, der Halter (2) insbesondere durch eine Feder (3) derartig in Position gehalten wird, daß die auf dem Drehzapfen (21) befindliche Rolle (4) gegen eine ebenfalls am Griffstück (1) angebrachte Führungsrolle (5) gedrückt wird, die Führungsrolle (5) seitlich überstehende Führungen (51) aufweist, das Material (41) von der Rolle (4) über die Führungsrolle (5) auf eine Spendeeinrichtung (6) geführt wird, mittels derer das Material (41) auf dem Untergrund plaziert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/07 (2006.01); B65H 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 35/0033 (2013.01); B65H 2801/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914317 U1 19991230; EP 1077193 A1 20010221; JP 2001072316 A 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030613

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021202

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TESA AG

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010807

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI