Global Patent Index - EP 1077250 A1

EP 1077250 A1 2001-02-21 - Aqueous cleaning formulations

Title (en)

Aqueous cleaning formulations

Title (de)

Wässrige Reinigungsformulierungen

Title (fr)

Formulations nettoyantes aqueuses

Publication

EP 1077250 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00305606 A

Priority

GB 9919324 A

Abstract (en)

An aqueous composition comprising (i) at least one metal hydroxide and/or metal silicate; (ii) a surfactant mixture comprising at least one alkyl glucoside and at least one nonionic surfactant; (iii) a quaternary ammonium disinfectant; (iv) a hydrotroping agent; and (v) optionally a chelating agent for use in the cleaning of milking and milk storage equipment such as bulk milk tanks, milk pipelines etc.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/94; C11D 3/02; C11D 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/48 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/88 (2006.01); C11D 1/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/044 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/48 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/883 (2013.01); C11D 1/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 4240921 A 19801223 - KANIECKI THADDEUS J [US]
  • [Y] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198105, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D25, AN 1981-07092D, XP002153269
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199744, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D25, AN 1997-475604, XP002153270
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 200025, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D25, AN 2000-291796, XP002153271
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199503, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D25, AN 1995-020603, XP002153272

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077250 A1 20010221; EP 1077250 B1 20050126; AT 287941 T 20050215; DE 60017648 D1 20050303; DE 60017648 T2 20060330; DK 1077250 T3 20050530; GB 9919324 D0 19991020

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-04-18 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-03-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060704

2006-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-07-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060703

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050729

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-07-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-08 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050705

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-07-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-07-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050703

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-06-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050623

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-05-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050507

2005-04-26 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050420

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017648 P 20050303

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-01-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2005-01-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050126

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/94 A

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/02 B

2004-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/08 B

2004-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AQUEOUS CLEANING FORMULATIONS

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 1/94 A

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/02 B

2004-07-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 11D 3/08 B

2004-07-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AQUEOUS CLEANING FORMULATIONS

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030523

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI