Global Patent Index - EP 1077267 A1

EP 1077267 A1 2001-02-21 - Apparatus for the continuous heat treatment of metal workpieces separately or in batches

Title (en)

Apparatus for the continuous heat treatment of metal workpieces separately or in batches

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Durchlaufwärmebehandeln von metallischen Werkstücken, einzeln oder gruppenweise

Title (fr)

Installation de traitement thermique de pièces métalliques en lots ou unitaires au défilé

Publication

EP 1077267 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99116269 A

Priority

EP 99116269 A

Abstract (en)

The first channel (11) of the two-channel cooling zone (8) has, along its length, a temperature gradient such that the temperature of the wall directly above the articles (2) is at least that of the condensation temperature of the elements. The second channel (12) walls have a temperature below the condensation temperature of the elements. Heat treatment furnace for metal articles (2) liable to give off elements having high evaporation pressure according to furnace temperature and gas flow and furnace composition comprises, in succession: (a) at least one inlet zone (1) for the articles (2); (b) at least one heating zone (3); (c) at least one cooling zone (8); (d) at least one device (13, 14) for feeding the articles (2) through the zones; and (e) at least one gas flow introduction device (15). The cooling zone (8) comprises two successive different sections (9, 10). The first section (9) extends from the end of the heating zone (3), or the heating channel, to the start of the second section (10), and comprises a channel (11) having, along the whole or part of its length, a temperature gradient such that the temperature of the wall directly above the articles (2) is at least that of the condensation temperature of the elements. The second section (10) comprises a channel (12) whose walls have a temperature below the condensation temperature of the elements.

Abstract (fr)

Four canal à circulation de flux gazeux, pour traiter des pièces (2) en un alliage susceptible d'émettre des éléments à pression de vapeur élevée (EPVE), comprenant successivement une zone d'entrée (1), une zone de chauffe (3) et une zone de refroidissement (8), ainsi qu'un moyen d'entraînement (13, 14) des pièces (2) et au moins un dispositif d'introduction du flux gazeux (15), dans lequel la zone de refroidissement (8) est constituée de deux secteurs (9, 10) successifs. Un premier secteur (9), suivant la zone de chauffe (3), présente un gradient de température entre les parties supérieure et inférieure tel que la paroi directement située au-dessus des pièces (2) est maintenue à une température supérieure ou égale à la température de condensation des EPVE. Dans un deuxième secteur (10) les parois ont une température inférieure à la température de condensation des EPVE. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 9/0056 (2013.01); C21D 9/0043 (2013.01); C21D 9/0062 (2013.01); C21D 9/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077267 A1 20010221; EP 1077267 B1 20040707; AT 270714 T 20040715; DE 69918548 D1 20040812; DE 69918548 T2 20050825

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PATHERM SA

- Free text: PATHERM SA#PLACE PURY 3#2001 NEUCHATEL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- PATHERM SA#PLACE PURY 3#2001 NEUCHATEL (CH)

2006-06-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: PATHERM SA

- Free text: PATHERM SA#CHEMIN LAUBSCHER 10#2503 BIENNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- PATHERM SA#PLACE PURY 3#2001 NEUCHATEL (CH)

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS SA

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050408

2004-10-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2004-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918548 P 20040812

2004-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2004-07-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040707

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR LI

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI