Global Patent Index - EP 1077268 A1

EP 1077268 A1 2001-02-21 - Composition for binder material

Title (en)

Composition for binder material

Title (de)

Bindermittelzusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition pour un matériau liant

Publication

EP 1077268 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00117444 A

Priority

  • US 37289699 A
  • US 63574600 A

Abstract (en)

A composite structural metal use, for example, in drill bit bodies is disclosed. The metal includes powdered tungsten carbide, and binder metal consisting of a composition by weight of manganese in a range of about zero to 25 percent, nickel in a range of about zero to 15 percent, zinc in a range of about 3 to 20 percent, tin in a range of more than 1 percent to about 10 percent, and copper making up about 24 to 96 percent by weight of the composition. In one embodiment, the composition includes about 6 to 7 percent tin therein. In another embodiment, the composition includes about 0-6 percent by weight of cobalt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 29/08; C22C 29/06; E21B 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 7/06 (2006.01); C22C 29/06 (2006.01); E21B 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 29/067 (2013.01); B22F 7/06 (2013.01); E21B 10/00 (2013.01); B22F 2005/001 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

MATRIX POWDERS FOR DIAMOND TOOLS (KENNAMETAL INC.) 1989, LATROBE, PA

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077268 A1 20010221; EP 1077268 B1 20030521; DE 60002795 D1 20030626; DE 60002795 T2 20040219; DE 60002795 T9 20040909; US 6461401 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150811

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150811

2015-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140812

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140806

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60002795

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120808

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2006-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60002795 P 20030626

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI