Global Patent Index - EP 1077271 A1

EP 1077271 A1 2001-02-21 - Chromium boride coatings

Title (en)

Chromium boride coatings

Title (de)

Chromborid-Überzüge

Title (fr)

Revêtements en borure de chrome

Publication

EP 1077271 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99116057 A

Priority

EP 99116057 A

Abstract (en)

A new family of chromium boride coatings having excellent adhesive wear and corrosion resistance is disclosed. The coatings comprise hard, ultrafine, chromium boride particles dispersed in a metal matrix, the particles having an average particle size of less than one micron and constituting less than about 30 volume percent of the coating, the balance being metal matrix. The metal matrix may be composed of nickel or a nickel base alloy containing a metal selected from the group consisting of chromium, silicon and iron. The coatings may be prepared by a process which comprises depositing a mechanically blended powder mixture of chromium metal or a chromium alloy or mixture of both, and a boron-containing alloy onto a substrate and then heat treating the as-deposited coating. The heat treatment effects a diffusion reaction between the deposited elements resulting in the formation of ultrafine particles of chromium boride dispersed in a metal matrix. The coating can be deposited onto the substrate using any of the known deposition techniques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/06; C23C 4/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/06 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/06 (2013.01); C23C 4/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077271 A1 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050113

2002-10-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI