Global Patent Index - EP 1077272 A1

EP 1077272 A1 2001-02-21 - Titanium carbide/tungsten boride coatings

Title (en)

Titanium carbide/tungsten boride coatings

Title (de)

Titankarbid/Wolframborid-Überzüge

Title (fr)

Revêtements en carbure de titane/borure de tungstène

Publication

EP 1077272 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99116068 A

Priority

EP 99116068 A

Abstract (en)

A family of titanium carbide/tungsten boride coatings having excellent wear and corrosion resistance is disclosed. The coatings comprise hard, ultrafine, titanium carbide particles and tungsten boride precipitates dispersed in a metal matrix, the two phases constituting from about 30 to abut 80 volume percent of the coating, the balance being metal matrix. The metal matrix contains nickel, cobalt and/or iron. The coatings may be prepared by depositing a mechanically blended powder mixture composed of separate components including a first component containing tungsten carbide and a second component containing boron and at least one metal selected from the group consisting of nickel, cobalt and iron, the powder mixture including titanium in the first or second component or in a separate third component, at least one of the first, second or third components having a melting point below about 1200 DEG C, and then heat treating the as-deposited coating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 4/06; C23C 4/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/06 (2006.01); C23C 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 4/18 (2013.01); C23C 4/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077272 A1 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20041204

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020919

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRAXAIR S.T. TECHNOLOGY, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI