Global Patent Index - EP 1077275 A1

EP 1077275 A1 2001-02-21 - Apparatus for detecting knotting state in creel

Title (en)

Apparatus for detecting knotting state in creel

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Knottenüberwachung an einem Spulengatter

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle des noeuds sur un cantre

Publication

EP 1077275 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00114073 A

Priority

JP 20007299 A

Abstract (en)

A creel 13 for arranging a large number of yarn-feeding bobbins has a nipping member 38 for holding an end of yarn led out of a newly placed yarn-feeding bobbin 12, a disk tensioner 40 for holding an end of yarn which is led out of an old yarn-feeding bobbin and which remains on the creel 13 at a predetermined position on the downstream side of the nipping member 38, and a knotter 42 for automatically knotting the two held yarns at a position between the two holders. There are further provided tension-applying means 15 and 34 for bringing a tension-applying lever 18 into contact with the knotted yarns 16 between the two holders by driving to thereby apply a predetermined amount of tension to the knotted yarns 16. There are further provided a detection piece 24 and a proximity sensor 32 for detecting a state of tension applied to the yarns 16 by the tension-applying means 15 and 34. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 1/00; B65H 69/00; D02H 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 59/40 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01); B65H 69/00 (2006.01); B65H 69/04 (2006.01); D02H 1/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 13/04 (2013.01); B65H 69/00 (2013.01); D02H 1/00 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077275 A1 20010221; JP 2001026376 A 20010130; KR 20010049750 A 20010615

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI