Global Patent Index - EP 1077278 A1

EP 1077278 A1 2001-02-21 - Warp knitting machine

Title (en)

Warp knitting machine

Title (de)

Kettenwirkmaschine

Title (fr)

Métier à tricoter chaîne

Publication

EP 1077278 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00116454 A

Priority

DE 19938871 A

Abstract (en)

The warp knitter has at least one bar which can be shifted along a given path, such as a laying bar with guide needles. One controlled motor acts on one end of the bar and a return mechanism acts on the other end as a second controlled motor. A control unit (18) sets the first motor (4 or 7) to shift the guide bar (1) in one racking direction with a directional force (P1 or P2) and the other motor (7 or 4) to move the guide bar (1) in the opposite direction (P2 or P1). The motors (4,7) apply the directional tension forces (S1,S2) on the bar movement lines. The bar is a strip (1). The control (18) has a proportional-integral (PI) control unit (11) to control the first or second motor (4,7) and a control (20) which reacts to the force component controls of the other motor (7,4). The control (18) passes the actual and nominal bar position values to the PI control (11) as absolute values. The scale (15) of the actual value transmitter is attached to the bar (1). The total setting path movement length of the bar (1) is at least 150 mm. The motors (4,7) are linear motors or rotary motors. The strip acting as the guide bar carries yarn guides, or it is perforated with yarn guide holes.

Abstract (de)

Eine Kettenwirkmaschine weist eine Barre auf, die um vorbestimmte Wege versetzbar ist. An beiden Enden der Barre greift jeweils ein Motor (4, 7) an. Mittels einer Steuervorrichtung (18) zieht der erste Motor (4 bzw. 7) die Barre um vorbestimmte Wege in der einen Versatzrichtung und der zweite Motor (7 bzw. 4) die Barre (1) um vorbestimmte Wege in der anderen Versatzrichtung. Der jeweils andere Motor übt eine entgegengerichtete Spannkraft (S2, S1) auf die Barre (1) aus. Die Barre ist vorzugsweise ein biegsames Band (1) Dies erlaubt höhere Betriebsgeschwindigkeiten und/oder geringere Zugkräfte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 27/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077278 A1 20010221; EP 1077278 B1 20030514; CN 1145722 C 20040414; CN 1284581 A 20010221; DE 19938871 C1 20010510; JP 2001073264 A 20010321; JP 3443079 B2 20030902; KR 20010049797 A 20010615

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50002153

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KARL MAYER TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH

- Free text: KARL MAYER TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH#BRUEHLSTRASSE 25#63179 OBERTSHAUSEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- KARL MAYER TEXTILMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH#BRUEHLSTRASSE 25#63179 OBERTSHAUSEN (DE)

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002153 P 20030618

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI