Global Patent Index - EP 1077283 A3

EP 1077283 A3 2001-05-16 - Press section

Title (en)

Press section

Title (de)

Pressenpartie

Title (fr)

Section de presse

Publication

EP 1077283 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115704 A

Priority

DE 19938979 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1077283A2] The press section of a machine for the prodn. and/or finishing of a fiber web has, in the direction of web travel (10), an initial pair of rollers higher than the following rollers. The press line (7) through the axes (6) of the leading press rollers (4,5) is aligned against the vertical (8), in the direction (10) of web travel, so that the fiber web (1) travels through the roller press gap (2) horizontally or pref. at a downwards angle. The pitch angle (9) of the press line (7) is angled against the vertical (8) by 10-20 degrees . At least one press blanket (3) moves through the first roller press gap (2) together with the fiber web (1) and on both sides of it. Of the rollers (4,5) where the press blanket (3) passes around them, at least some rollers and pref. all of them (4,5) have mantle surfaces which are grooved and/or carry blind drillings. The rollers (4,5) have catch units (12) to take and dispose of water spun off the rollers and blankets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02; D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077283 A2 20010221; EP 1077283 A3 20010516; EP 1077283 B1 20040512; DE 19938979 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160721

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50006381

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150713

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100722

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-08-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006381 P 20040617

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI