Global Patent Index - EP 1077287 A2

EP 1077287 A2 2001-02-21 - Elastic tie plate for railway track

Title (en)

Elastic tie plate for railway track

Title (de)

Elastische Gleisunterlagplatte

Title (fr)

Selle d'appui élastique pour voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1077287 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500180 A

Priority

ES 9901909 A

Abstract (en)

Elastic tie plate for railway track, of a generally rectangular shape moulded with an ether-ester thermoplastic elastomer. On its upper face it has projections (1) arranged in rows and columns, positioned in the direction of the rail and with its upper face coplanar, said plane reaching as far as the plate edges (2) perpendicular to the rail, whilst the edges (3) parallel to it are situated in a slightly lower plane, forming rectangular bands (4) parallel to each side. On its lower face it has projections slightly smaller than projections (1), as well as discontinuous lips of truncated pyramid shape, on the sides perpendicular to the rail, which fit externally over the crosstie. The upper plane of the power face projections reaches as far as the four sides of the plate and extends on each of the sides parallel to the rail in corresponding flat lips (7), whilst on the perpendicular sides corresponding rectangular bands appear, on the inside and on an intermediate plane. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 9/686 (2013.01); E01B 9/685 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077287 A2 20010221; EP 1077287 A3 20010718; ES 2156564 A1 20010616; ES 2156564 B1 20020401

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060112

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040908

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-02-27 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PLASTICOS MONDRAGON, S.A.

2002-02-27 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DU PONT IBERICA, S.A.

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VERGARA RUBIO, ANTONIO

2002-02-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BELTRAN ORTI, JOSE MIGUEL

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI