Global Patent Index - EP 1077289 A2

EP 1077289 A2 2001-02-21 - Ground working device

Title (en)

Ground working device

Title (de)

Bodenbearbeitungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour travailler le sol

Publication

EP 1077289 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00307080 A

Priority

  • CA 2280297 A
  • CA 2293885 A

Abstract (en)

A ground working device is formed from a sub-frame (18) having a first side and a second side, plural discs (28) mounted for rotation on the sub-frame between the first side and the second side about an axis that extends from the first side to the second side; and a set of scoops (42) mounted on each disc in ground contacting position. The scoops efficiently lift the ground surface material, which falls to the ground in a sorted manner with coarser material on top. A motor is operatively connected to the plural discs for rotating the discs about the axis. Each scoop in each set of scoops has a ground working face that extends transversely to the disc on which the respective scoop is mounted. The scoops each have concave ground contacting surfaces. Each scoop is received in a respective slot (37) in the disc in which the respective scoop is mounted. The ground working device is mounted on a main frame, which is provided with ground engaging wheels. The sub-frame is retractably mounted on the main frame. Plural individually retractable teeth (118) are secured to the frame and extend away from the lower part of the frame in a ground contacting array. Teeth for the ground working device are formed as part of a retractable tooth assembly (110). A retractable tooth assembly preferably comprises a tooth carrier (112) on one end of which a tooth is slidably mounted, and on the other end of which is mounted a tooth position fixative, with a position adjustable rigid link connecting the tooth position fixative and the tooth. The retractable tooth assembly preferably extends through the frame from a first side to a second side, the retractable tooth assembly being secured to the frame on the first side and the tooth forming a working end on the second side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/088; E01C 23/082

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 21/00 (2006.01); E01C 23/082 (2006.01); E01C 23/088 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/082 (2013.01); E01C 21/00 (2013.01); E01C 23/088 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 5795096 A 19980818 - CULVER LARRY G [CA]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077289 A2 20010221; EP 1077289 A3 20030108; AU 5348100 A 20010222; AU 777976 B2 20041104

INPADOC legal status


2008-12-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080502

2007-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050915

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050915

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030708

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 01C 23/088 A, 7E 01C 23/082 B, 7E 01C 21/00 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI