Global Patent Index - EP 1077293 A2

EP 1077293 A2 2001-02-21 - Toilet bowl

Title (en)

Toilet bowl

Title (de)

Toilettenmuschel

Title (fr)

Cuvette de toilette

Publication

EP 1077293 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890247 A

Priority

AT 142699 A

Abstract (en)

Toilet flushing bivalve has flushing water inlets (2) along wall in a separate ring for flushing away the contents and a bivalve wall inserted as a separate part (12) in an outer bearer part. The jet direction of the flushing water inlets is inclined in a conventional manner in the peripheral direction at an angle to the bivalve and each inlet has a separate feed line (6) associated with it.

Abstract (de)

Eine Toilettenmuschel mit entlang der Wandung in einem gesonderten Ring (11) gehaltenen Spülwassereinläufen (2) zum Wegspülen des Inhaltes besitzt eine Muschelwand, die als eigener Teil (12) in einem äußeren Tragteil (13) eingesetzt ist. Die Strahlrichtung der Spülwassereinläufe (2) ist in an sich bekannter Weise in Umfangsrichtung schräg zur Muschelwand geneigt und jedem Spülwassereinlauf (2) ist eine gesonderte Zuleitung (6) zugeordnet. Dadurch wird eine verbesserte Spülwirkung erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/06 (2006.01); E03D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 11/06 (2013.01); E03D 11/08 (2013.01); E03D 2201/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077293 A2 20010221; EP 1077293 A3 20020605; AT 408108 B 20010925; AT A142699 A 20010115; US 6247193 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021206

2003-04-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI