Global Patent Index - EP 1077298 A2

EP 1077298 A2 2001-02-21 - Scaffolding

Title (en)

Scaffolding

Title (de)

Gerüst

Title (fr)

Echafaudage

Publication

EP 1077298 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202809 A

Priority

NL 1012857 A

Abstract (en)

Scaffolding comprising an upright (1) which is suitable to be erected substantially vertically from a base, a longitudinal member (3) which is suitable for fixing an upright (1) in the longitudinal direction and is suitable for connection to at least one upright (1) via the coupling means, in which scaffolding the coupling means comprises a clamping ring (4) which can be removed from and arranged around the upright (1), and a clamp (5), which is suspended in the clamping ring and can rotate about an axis which, in normal operation, runs substantially vertically, for clamping in a longitudinal member (3) which can be fitted through it, and connection means (6) for releasably connecting at least a longitudinal member to the clamping ring (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/14; E04G 7/20; E04G 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/14 (2006.01); E04G 7/20 (2006.01); E04G 7/22 (2006.01); E04G 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/22 (2013.01); E04G 7/14 (2013.01); E04G 7/20 (2013.01); E04G 7/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077298 A2 20010221; EP 1077298 A3 20020206; NL 1012857 C2 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050330

2002-10-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020806

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04G 7/14 A, 7E 04G 7/20 B, 7E 04G 7/22 B, 7E 04G 7/30 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI