Global Patent Index - EP 1077305 A1

EP 1077305 A1 2001-02-21 - Shank adapter

Title (en)

Shank adapter

Title (de)

Einsteckende eines Bohrerschafts

Title (fr)

Adaptateur de tiges

Publication

EP 1077305 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00306588 A

Priority

GB 9918197 A

Abstract (en)

A shank adapter 12 for rock drilling is provided with an end form 50,58 which can accept either a drill rod or a rock bolt, making the same adapter usable for drilling and for rock bolting. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 6/00; B25D 17/00; E21B 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/03 (2006.01); E21B 17/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/0426 (2013.01); E21B 17/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2352671 A 20010207; GB 2352671 B 20030618; GB 9918197 D0 19991006; AU 5052600 A 20010208; CA 2314834 A1 20010203; EP 1077305 A1 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20021217

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI GB IE SE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NORDIN, OLOF

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: O'BRIEN, JOHN

2001-04-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MARKLUND, JAN

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI GB IE SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI