Global patent index - EP 1077306 A2

EP 1077306 A2 2001-02-21 - Mobile work apparatus

Title (en)

Mobile work apparatus

Title (de)

Fahrbares Arbeitsgerät

Title (fr)

Machine de travaux mobile

Publication

EP 1077306 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116456 A

Priority

DE 19938578 A

Abstract (en)

The mobile mining work apparatus has a movement mechanism frame (10) and a work intermediary arm (18) along which a boring, ramming or similar tool can move. The movement frame has a chain running mechanism (12) which supports a rotatable upper carriage (14). The work intermediary arm is supported by the movement frame via a support mechanism (16). The support mechanism has two spaced apart support guides (20,24), the first ends of which are connected via first spaced rotary bearings (22,26) with the movement frame and their second ends via second spaced rotary bearings (30,32) with an intermediate guide (34). The intermediate guide, via a third rotary bearing (50), is connected with the work intermediary arm and via a fourth rotary bearing (52) supports a neck support arrangement (54), which with its free end, via a fifth rotary bearing (56) engages on the work intermediary arm.

Abstract (de)

Um einen Mäkler (18), der über eine Tragmechanik (16) auf einem Fahrgestell (10) angeordnet ist, sowohl nach vorne als auch nach hinten in eine im wesentlichen horizontale Stellung umlegen zu können, hat die Tragmechanik (16) mindestens einen in der Länge einstellbaren Traglenker (24), der einen doppelt wirkenden hydraulischen Arbeitszylinder umfaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/02 (2006.01); E21B 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/028 (2013.01); E21B 15/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0861967 A2 19980902 - DELMAG MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077306 A2 20010221; EP 1077306 A3 20021009; EP 1077306 B1 20061011; CA 2316494 A1 20010218; DE 19938578 A1 20010222; DE 50013592 D1 20061123; US 6405492 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-09-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070712

2006-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50013592

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-11-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2005-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041230

2003-08-07 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-07-16 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2003-07-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-10-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 15/04 A, 7E 21B 15/00 B, 7E 21B 7/02 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI