Global Patent Index - EP 1077307 A1

EP 1077307 A1 2001-02-21 - Cable connection between two rods of an auger

Title (en)

Cable connection between two rods of an auger

Title (de)

Kabelverbindung zwischen zwei Gestängeschüssen eines Schneckenbohrers

Title (fr)

Connexion de câble entre deux tiges d'une tarière

Publication

EP 1077307 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112795 A

Priority

DE 29914494 U

Abstract (en)

A cable is fed in each link (12,13) between inner and outer pipes (15,16). The outer pipe is provided with openings (19,20) at both ends. The openings are arranged at fixed angular positions with respect to the coupling position. A connector part (21) is arranged at the openings. Connector piece (22) comprises complementary connector parts (23) and a cable connector (24). An Independent claim is also included for a link for a screw boring machine.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kabelverbindung zwischen zwei Gestängeschüssen eines Schneckenbohrers, die über eine drehfeste Kupplung winkelfest in einer vorgegebenen Koppelposition lösbar miteinander verbunden sind. Die Gestängeschüsse (12,13) weisen ein Innen- (16) und ein die Wendel tragendes Aussenrohr (15) auf. Es ist vorgesehen, dass in jedem Gestängeschuss zwischen Innen- und Aussenrohr ein Kabel (18) geführt ist, dass das Aussenrohr (15) an seinen beiden Enden mit jeweils einer Durchtrittsöffnung (19,20) im Rohrmantel des Aussenrohres (15) versehen ist, dass die beiden Durchtrittsöffnungen (19,20) winkelfest in vorgegebener Winkellage zur Koppelposition angeordnet sind, dass jeweils ein Steckverbinderteil (21,23) an den Durchtrittsöffnungen (19,20) angeordnet ist, und dass ein die Gestängeschüsse am Aussenrohr überbrückendes Verbindungsstück (22) mit komplementären Steckverbinderteilen (21,23) sowie einer Kabelverbindung (24) zur Verbindung von gegenüberliegenden Steckverbinderteilen zweier Gestängeschüsse (12,13) vorhanden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/02; E21B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2006.01); E21B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/44 (2013.01); E21B 17/028 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19819626 A1 19990415 - TRACTO TECHNIK [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29914494 U1 19991007; EP 1077307 A1 20010221; EP 1077307 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009082 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040415

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001220

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI