Global Patent Index - EP 1077316 A2

EP 1077316 A2 2001-02-21 - Radiator cap

Title (en)

Radiator cap

Title (de)

Kühlerverschlussdeckel

Title (fr)

Bouchon de radiateur

Publication

EP 1077316 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202773 A

Priority

  • EP 00202773 A
  • EP 99830517 A

Abstract (en)

A radiator cap (10), highly capable of reliable operation, comprises a cover (12), an internal cap (14) snap-fastened inside said cover (12), said internal cap (14) having an opening (16) shut off by a valve body (18) which is closed under stress and constitutes a pressure-relief valve sealed by means of a seat (22) provided with a gasket (24), said valve body (18) being shaped like an inverted cup provided with an inflow opening (26) shut off by a shutter (28) which is closed under stress by elastic means (30) in a single piece with the shutter (28) and constitutes a low-pressure valve. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/0238 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077316 A2 20010221; EP 1077316 A3 20030102

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-10-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-09-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI