Global Patent Index - EP 1077331 A3

EP 1077331 A3 2002-09-25 - Liquid drop spraying apparatus

Title (en)

Liquid drop spraying apparatus

Title (de)

Sprühapparat für Flüssigkeitstropfen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pulvérisation pour gouttes liquides

Publication

EP 1077331 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00307094 A

Priority

  • JP 23327799 A
  • JP 2000225953 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1077331A2] In a liquid drop spraying or ejecting device, an introducing hole 12 is provided in orthogonal direction relative to the lower face of a pressure chamber lOn, and is vertically connected to the upper face of a flow path 20. Immediately underneath the introducing hole 12, a shock wave absorption face 21 with a depth D that is twice the diameter L of the introducing hole 12 is formed as a protrusion of the lower face of the flow path 20. In addition, the shock absorption face 21 is wider than the diameter of the circle of the introducing hole 12, and a stepped portion 22 is formed at its periphery. In this manner, in a device having a plurality of the pressure chambers and the liquid is pressurised by a piezoelectric/electrostrictive element for the purpose of spraying, back flow generated at the flow path from the introducing hole is reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/04; B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); F04B 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/046 (2013.01); B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14306 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14419 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077331 A2 20010221; EP 1077331 A3 20020925; JP 2001121693 A 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030321

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI