Global Patent Index - EP 1077332 A2

EP 1077332 A2 2001-02-21 - Fluid pressure controller for pumps

Title (en)

Fluid pressure controller for pumps

Title (de)

Fluiddruckregler für Pumpen

Title (fr)

Régulateur de pression de fluide pour pompes

Publication

EP 1077332 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00117204 A

Priority

IT PD990194 A

Abstract (en)

A device for controlling the operation of pumps in hydraulic circuits by detecting the pressure of the circuit and consequently activating or stopping the pump. The device comprises an oscillating circuit (23), in which the capacitor (17) is a capacitive transducer which cooperates with at least one mechanical actuator (10) for actuating at least one of the plates (15, 18) of the capacitor (17), and means for interfacing with the pump; the actuator (10) is subjected to the pressure of the fluid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077332 A2 20010221; EP 1077332 A3 20020410; IT 1307380 B1 20011106; IT PD990194 A1 20010219

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070307

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061027

2006-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALBA SERVIZI FIDUCIARI SA

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WORLDWIDE ENGINEERING LLC

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021004

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 49/02 A, 7G 01L 9/12 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI