Global patent index - EP 1077344 A2

EP 1077344 A2 2001-02-21 - Lamp

Title (en)

Lamp

Title (de)

Leuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe

Publication

EP 1077344 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116700 A

Priority

  • DE 19938734 A
  • DE 20004188 U

Abstract (en)

The light has at least one light source and at least one non-plane reflector associated with the light source. The light source has a directional radiation characteristic distributed about a central light source axis and the reflector deflects light from the source in a main beam direction. The light source (10) is arranged so that the central light source axis (14) is not parallel to the main beam direction (16).

Abstract (de)

Eine Leuchte, insbesondere Fahrzeugleuchte, umfaßt wenigstens eine Lichtquelle (10) und wenigstens einen dieser Lichtquelle zugeordneten, nicht ebenen Reflektor (12), wobei die Lichtquelle eine gerichtete, um eine Lichtquellenzentralachse (14) verteilte Abstrahlcharakteristik besitzt, und der Reflektor von der Lichtquelle kommendes Licht in einer Hauptabstrahlrichtung (16) reflektriert. Zur Erzielung einer möglichst kleinen Bauform und eines homogenen, vom Reflektor abgegebenen Lichtbündels ist vorgesehen, daß die Lichtquelle so angeordnet ist, daß die Lichtquellenzentralachse zur Hauptabstrahlrichtung nicht parallel verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/10; F21V 7/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/23 (2013.01); F21S 48/215 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077344 A2 20010221; EP 1077344 A3 20040128

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-10-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040127

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI