Global Patent Index - EP 1077348 A1

EP 1077348 A1 2001-02-21 - Gas radiant heater

Title (en)

Gas radiant heater

Title (de)

Gasbeheizter Wärmestrahler

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage par rayonnement chauffé à gaz

Publication

EP 1077348 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121839 A

Priority

  • DE 29516643 U
  • EP 96116842 A

Abstract (en)

The heating gases are conducted along a converter (24) which has conductor ducts (27) open at the bottom. The converter has a structured surface providing a heat exchange surface at least double, preferably quadruple, the size of the active radiation surface. The converter consists of a ridged plate with downward pointing ridges (26) with ridges at least double the height of the thickness of the plate between the ridges. The converter is contained in a hood (10) open at the bottom and under which the heating gases from the burner (15) are conducted. The burner has a burner chamber (16) running along one edge (14) of the elongated hood. The heating gases flow crosswise to the hood's lengthwise direction and flow out at the opposite edge (23). The hood's outside has thermal insulation (11) with at least parts of the inside acting as a reflector surface. The burner has a burner pipe (19) with gas outlets (20) and longer than the burner chamber which has an outlet (18).

Abstract (de)

Der Wärmestrahler weist eine nach unten offene Haube (10) auf, in der ein Konverter (24) angeordnet ist. An einem Rand (14) der Haube (10) ist ein Brenner (15) angeordnet, dessen Heizgase durch den Konverter (24) strömen und diesen aufheizen. Der Konverter wandelt die ihm zugeführte Wärme in Eigenstrahlung um und strahlt diese nach unten ab. Der Brenner (15) kann als atmosphärischer Brenner betrieben werden. Der Wärmestrahler hat einen hohen Wirkungsgrad und ist leichtgewichtig und kostengünstig herstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/12; F24C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/12 (2006.01); F24C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/042 (2013.01); F23D 14/125 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14121 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29516643 U1 19970220; AT 200567 T 20010415; AT 250202 T 20031015; EP 0769658 A1 19970423; EP 0769658 B1 20010411; EP 1077348 A1 20010221; EP 1077348 B1 20030917

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59610724

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141204

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131019

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131019

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAUMANNS HERBERT

- Effective date: 20091031

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040113

2003-12-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610724 P 20031023

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ING. MARCO ZARDI C/O M. ZARDI & CO. S.A.

2003-09-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0769658 P

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021104

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-02-21 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 769658

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB LI NL SE