Global patent index - EP 1077351 A1

EP 1077351 A1 2001-02-21 - Electrical control device for a radiator, esp. an electrical towel drier

Title (en)

Electrical control device for a radiator, esp. an electrical towel drier

Title (de)

Elektrisches Steuergerät für einen Heizkörper, insbesondere einen elektrischen Handtuchtrockner

Title (fr)

Dispositif électrique de commande d'un radiateur, en particulier d'un radiateur électrique sèche-serviettes

Publication

EP 1077351 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440227 A

Priority

EP 99440227 A

Abstract (en)

The control unit, especially for an electric radiator and towel drier with a heating element (2) inside a housing (3) e.g. filled with a heating fluid, consists of a cover (9) containing a switch or relay (5) which is operated directly by an actuator (6) or remotely via an infrared or radio frequency receiver. The cover has a hole (10) for a power feed cable (19) and a coupling (12) which plugs onto the radiator as its switch connector (7) engages with pins (8) on the heating element. The switch and actuator can be in two separate circuits, e.g. a power circuit for the swith and a low tension control circuit for the actuator.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un dispositif électrique de commande d'un radiateur, en particulier d'un radiateur électrique sèche-serviettes. Dispositif caractérisé en ce qu'il est essentiellement constitué par un moyen électrique (1) de commande d'un dispositif de chauffe (2) intégré dans un élément chauffant (3) et par un moyen (4) de réglage rapide en position dudit moyen de commande (1) par rapport à l'élément chauffant (3). L'invention est plus particulièrement applicable dans le domaine des équipements domestiques, notamment de chauffage et plus particulièrement les radiateurs du type sèche-serviettes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/18; F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/18 (2006.01); F24H 9/20 (2006.01); F24H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/1863 (2013.01); F24H 9/2014 (2013.01); F24H 3/004 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077351 A1 20010221; EP 1077351 B1 20011031; DE 69900417 D1 20011206; DE 69900417 T2 20020718

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69900417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110910

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-06-26 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-12-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2001-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900417

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-12-06

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI