Global Patent Index - EP 1077352 A2

EP 1077352 A2 2001-02-21 - Protection device for hot water storage

Title (en)

Protection device for hot water storage

Title (de)

Schutzvorrichtung für Warmwasserspeicher

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection pour accumulateur d'eau chaude

Publication

EP 1077352 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116822 A

Priority

DE 19939134 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a measurement anode (40) protruding into the storage vol. that is supplied with external current and connected to evaluation electronics (44). The evaluation electronics are connected to a controller (32) for the tank heater and if the anode current is not present a blocking signal is transmitted to the controller to positively prevent operation of the tank heater (16).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schutzvorrichtung für einen Warmwasserspeicher mit einer wärmebedarfsabhängig gesteuerten Speicherheizung (16), mit einer in den Speicherraum ragenden Meßanode (40), die durch Fremdstrom gespeist und an einer Auswerteelektronik (44, 50) angeschlossen ist. Es wird vorgeschlagen, daß die vorzugsweise über das Netzteil (46) im Heizgerät (16) versorgte Auswerteelektronik (44, 50) der Fremdstromanode mit der Steuereinrichtung (32, 54) der Speicherheizung (16) verbunden ist und bei Fehlen des Anodenstroms ein die Inbetriebnahme der Speicherheizung (16) zwangsläufig verhinderndes Sperrsignal an die Steuereinrichtung übermittelt. Dadurch wird verhindert, daß ein Warmwasserspeicher in Betrieb genommen und beschädigt werden kann, wenn eine ausreichende Schutzwirkung nicht gegeben ist oder wenn die zugeführte Heizenergie vom Speicherwasser nicht aufgenommen werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01); F24H 1/18 (2006.01); F24H 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0047 (2013.01); F24H 9/2007 (2013.01); F24H 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077352 A2 20010221; EP 1077352 A3 20021218; DE 19939134 C1 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050322

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041111

2003-09-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-08-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-12-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24H 9/20 A, 7C 23F 13/04 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI