Global Patent Index - EP 1077356 A1

EP 1077356 A1 2001-02-21 - Multi-staged condenser with cooling circuit

Title (en)

Multi-staged condenser with cooling circuit

Title (de)

Mehrstöckiger Umlaufkondensator

Title (fr)

Condenseur à circulation multiétagé

Publication

EP 1077356 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117878 A

Priority

DE 19939294 A

Abstract (en)

The two parallel heat exchangers (4,20) are present and at least one receptacle device (30b,30c,30d) for the liquid in the intermediate chamber (13) between the heat exchangers. Apparatus for evaporating of liquid has a heat exchanger which holds evaporator passage for the liquid and liquid passage for a heat medium, and has at least two circulation sections arranged one on top of the other. The evaporator passages each hold an inlet for the liquid above one end of a circulation section and an outlet for the liquid above one end of a circulation and agents are present to pass liquid from the outlet of the lower circulation section. An Independent claim is included for use of the apparatus in a process for cryogenic separation of air in a twin column device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Verdampfen einer Flüssigkeit mit einem Wärmeaustauscher, der Verdampfungspassagen (7, 10) für die Flüssigkeit und Verflüssigungspassagen für ein Heizmedium besitzt und mindestens zwei übereinander angeordnete Umlaufabschnitte (a, b) aufweist. Die Verdampfungspassagen (7, 10) besitzen jeweils am unteren Ende eines Umlaufabschnittes (a, b) eine Eintrittsöffnung für die Flüssigkeit und jeweils am oberen Ende eines Umlaufabschnittes eine Austrittsöffnung für die Flüssigkeit. Femer sind Mittel zum Führen von Flüssigkeit von der Austrittsöffnung eines Umlaufabschnittes zu der Eintrittsöffnung des darunterliegenden Umlaufabschnittes vorgesehen. Mindestens zwei parallel geschaltete Wärmeaustauscher (4) sind so angeordnet, daß sich in dem Zwischenraum (13) zwischen den Wärmeaustauschern (4) mindestens eine Aufnahmevorrichtung für Flüssigkeit befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/00 (2006.01); F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 5/005 (2013.01); F25J 2250/02 (2013.01); F25J 2250/10 (2013.01); F25J 2250/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077356 A1 20010221; DE 19939294 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040707

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021205

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010724

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI