Global Patent Index - EP 1077433 A1

EP 1077433 A1 2001-02-21 - Data aquisition and transfer

Title (en)

Data aquisition and transfer

Title (de)

Datenerfassung und -übertragung

Title (fr)

Saisie et transfer de données

Publication

EP 1077433 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00307044 A

Priority

  • US 14984799 P
  • US 63884500 A

Abstract (en)

A data system includes a tag system (120) in a vehicle that transmits data to an interrogator (300). In the vehicle data relating to the vehicle systems is applied to the tag system (120) and data from an external device (600) is applied to the tag system (120). The data from the external device (600) is unrelated to the vehicle systems. External devices (600) include an electronic compass that provides data relating to the heading of the vehicle and a tone sensor (510) that provides data relating to a service facility (600) used by the vehicle (100). A service facility (600) includes a fuel dispenser (600) in which pump information is acoustically transmitted to the sensor (510) via the fuel being provided to the vehicle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 5/008 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077433 A1 20010221

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030522

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IE IT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KALOKITIS, DAVID

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JOHNSON, HENRY C.

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PAGLIONE, ROBERT WAYNE

2001-02-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHEPPS, JONATHAN LLOYD

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI