Global Patent Index - EP 1077438 A1

EP 1077438 A1 2001-02-21 - A method for central gathering of a data

Title (en)

A method for central gathering of a data

Title (de)

Verfahren zur zentralen Erfassung von Daten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour central rassembler des données

Publication

EP 1077438 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115639 A

Priority

EP 99115639 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves matching the switch-on times and durations of the receiver to the transmission times of the transmitters, which transmit at different times. Each transmission of data takes place periodically within a period up to the next planned data transmission of new data with an integral number of repetitions, the different data transmissions of the individual transmitters take place in total in a periodically repeating time interval and the individual data transmissions of the different transmitters have fixed associated transmission times within the time interval.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur zentralen Erfassung von Daten, die von verschiedenen Sendern an einen Empfänger drahtlos übertragen werden, wobei die Einschaltzeitpunkte und die jeweilige Einschaltdauer des Empfängers auf die Übertragungszeiten der entsprechenden Sender abgestimmt werden und die Übertragungen der jeweiligen Sender zueinander zeitlich beabstandet erfolgen. Um die Kosten und den Energieverbrauch des Empfängers bei der Bestimmung der zukünftigen Sendezeitpunkte zu reduzieren, und einen Empfang der senderseitigen Übertragungen sicherzustellen, sollen die Einschaltzeitpunkte und die jeweilige Einschaltdauer des Empfängers auf die Übertragungszeiten der entsprechenden Sender abgestimmt werden und die Übertragungen der jeweiligen Sender zueinander zeitlich beabstandet erfolgen, wobei jede Datenübertragung innerhalb des Zeitraumes bis zur nächsten planmäßigen Übertragung von neuen Daten mit einer ganzzahligen Wiederholanzahl periodisch erneut erfolgt, die verschiedenen Datenübertragungen der einzelnen Sender in ihrer Gesamtheit in einem sich periodisch wiederholenden Zeitintervall erfolgen und die einzelnen Datenübertragungen der verschiedenen Sender innerhalb dieses Zeitintervalles fest zugeordnete Sendezeitpunkte haben.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/10; G08C 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/10 (2006.01); G08C 15/12 (2006.01); G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/10 (2013.01); G08C 15/12 (2013.01); G08C 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077438 A1 20010221; EP 1077438 B1 20040506; AT 266236 T 20040515; DE 59909407 D1 20040609; DK 1077438 T3 20040913

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-03-31 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2006-03-31 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2005-08-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050807

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909407 P 20040609

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR IT

2004-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VITERRA ENERGY SERVICES GMBH & CO. KG

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK FR IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FR IT

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI