Global patent index - EP 1077440 A1

EP 1077440 A1 2001-02-21 - ELECTRONIC SEAL

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC SEAL

Title (de)

ELEKTRONISCHES SIEGEL

Title (fr)

SCELLEMENT ELECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 1077440 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99916935 A

Priority

  • ES 9900122 W
  • ES 9800940 A
  • ES 9800968 A

Abstract (en)

It is comprised of a closure element (4) for closing the medium to be sealed and is characterized in that it also hat signal emitting means (2) which are connected to the closure element (4) forming the signal conducting means. The conductor (4) is connected to signal receiver means (3). It also has incorrect reception signalling means (13, 14) indicating that the conductor element (4) has been manipulated. It includes means (20) for stopping the operation of the sealed device upon detection of a fraudulent manipulation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/03; B67D 5/33; G08B 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/08 (2010.01); B67D 7/22 (2010.01); B67D 7/34 (2010.01); G09F 3/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/0376 (2013.01); B67D 7/08 (2013.01); B67D 7/222 (2013.01); B67D 7/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9957701A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077440 A1 20010221; EP 1077440 B1 20020417; DE 69901298 D1 20020523; WO 9957701 A1 19991111; WO 9957701 A8 20000504

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-05-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-04-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-01-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-07-18 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020718

2002-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69901298

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-23

2002-04-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-04-17 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010608

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT