Global Patent Index - EP 1077451 A2

EP 1077451 A2 2001-02-21 - Electrical cable or electrical line with a braided shield

Title (en)

Electrical cable or electrical line with a braided shield

Title (de)

Elektrisches Kabel oder elektrische Leitung mit einem Schirmgeflecht

Title (fr)

Câble électrique ou ligne électrique avec une tresse de blindage

Publication

EP 1077451 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00115774 A

Priority

DE 19938776 A

Abstract (en)

The cable or lead has a core consisting of electrical conductors and insulation and an electrically conducting screen with a mesh (GE) of groups of wires (FRE1-FRE12) wound in opposite directions with equal pitch angle and an enveloping cable sleeve. The number of first groups of wires (DR11-DR91;DL1-DL91) in one winding direction in the screen mesh is greater than in the opposite direction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein elektrisches Kabel oder eine elektrische Leitung mit einem elektrisch leitenden Schirm aus einem Geflecht (GE), bei dem in gegenläufigen Wendelrichtungen in Fachungen (FRE.., FRL..) zusammengefaßte Drähte (DR.., DL..) aufgewendelt sind. Dabei ist die Anzahl der in der einen Wendelrichtung aufgewendelten Fachungen (FRE..) größer als die Anzahl der in der gegenläufigen Wendelrichtung aufgewendelten zweiten Fachungen (FLE..). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 11/1033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077451 A2 20010221; EP 1077451 A3 20011205; DE 19938776 A1 20010222

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-10-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI