Global patent index - EP 1077468 A1

EP 1077468 A1 2001-02-21 - Colour cathode ray tube with tension mask

Title (en)

Colour cathode ray tube with tension mask

Title (de)

Farbbildröhre mit einer Spannmaske

Title (fr)

Tube cathodique en couleur à masque de tension

Publication

EP 1077468 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99116060 A

Priority

EP 99116060 A

Abstract (en)

The image tube has an essentially rectangular shadow mask (25) and a frame carrying the mask. The mask is tensioned in two essentially mutually perpendicular directions and is clamped into the frame on two opposing sides, both of the other sides not being connected to the frame. The sides not connected to the frame are strengthened at the edges (29) wrt. the inner surface and have an inward curvature. Independent claims are also included for a colour TV and for a colour monitor.

Abstract (de)

Bei Schattenmasken, die in vertikaler und horizontaler Richtung eine Vorspannung aufweisen und deren horizontale Vorspannung durch Streckung in vertikaler Richtung erzeugt wird, läßt sich teures Maskenmaterial mit einem niedrigen thermischen Ausdehnungskoeffizienten nur dann durch ein preisgünstigeres Maskenmaterial wie z.B. Eisen ersetzen, wenn zur Vorspannung der Maske in horizontaler Richtung deutlich höhere Zugkräfte als bisher erzeugt werden können. Dazu werden die äußeren Ränder der Seiten der Schattenmaske, die nicht mit dem Maskenrahmen verbunden sind, bogenförmig und in einer erhöhten Festigkeit ausgeführt. Dadurch lassen sich senkrecht zur Streckrichtung größere Zugkräfte als bisher erzeugen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077468 A1 20010221; CZ 20002948 A3 20020417; JP 2001076642 A 20010323; JP 3549816 B2 20040804; US 6489713 B1 20021203

INPADOC legal status

2006-10-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060425

2004-03-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MT PICTURE DISPLAY GERMANY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MATSUSHITA DISPLAY DEVICES (GERMANY) GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-11-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 20010330

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI