Global Patent Index - EP 1077495 A2

EP 1077495 A2 2001-02-21 - Process and device for manufacturing an electro-optic device

Title (en)

Process and device for manufacturing an electro-optic device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines elektrooptischen Bauteils

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication d'un dispositif électro-optique

Publication

EP 1077495 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117637 A

Priority

DE 19939364 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves forming a moulded body of transparent, malleable material in an injection mould (1) with an opening for the insertion of an electrooptical transducer bearer and a coupling region for a coupled device. A closure device (4) is applied to the coupling region (3), the material is fed into the mould, the bearer is inserted through the opening and aligned wrt. the mould with at least one positioning device, the material is set and the closure device is removed. An Independent claim is also included for a mould for manufacturing an electrooptical component.

Abstract (de)

Ein erfindungsgemäßes Verfahren zum Herstellen eines elektrooptischen Bauteils, welches einen Formkörper aus einem lichtdurchlässigen, formbaren Material aufweist, wobei dieser Formkörper in einer verlorenen Form durch Gießen ausgeformt wird, und wobei diese Gießform (1) eine Gießöffnung (2) zum Einführen eines Trägers eines elektrooptischen Wandlers aufweist, sowie die Form einen Ankopplungsbereich (3) für einen Kopplungspartner hat, weist die folgenden Schritte auf: das Einführen des Trägers durch die Gießöffnung (2) in die Gießform (1); das Ausrichten des Trägers relativ zu der Gießform (2) mittels zumindest einer Positioniereinrichtung; das Einbringen einer lösbaren Verschlußeinrichtung (4) in den Ankopplungsbereich (3); das Einfüllen des formbaren Materials in die Gießform (2); das Aushärten des formbaren Materials; und das Entfernen der Verschlußeinrichtung (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 33/00; H01R 13/627; H01R 13/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6271 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077495 A2 20010221; EP 1077495 A3 20030813; DE 19939364 A1 20010308; DE 19939364 B4 20050203; US 6740264 B1 20040525

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01L 33/00 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/66 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 13/627 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7G 02B 6/42 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 29C 39/10 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 29C 33/00 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 29C 39/26 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI