Global Patent Index - EP 1077502 A2

EP 1077502 A2 2001-02-21 - MMIC-to-waveguide RF transition and associated method

Title (en)

MMIC-to-waveguide RF transition and associated method

Title (de)

RF-Übergang von MMIC auf Hohlleiter und dazugehöriges Verfahren

Title (fr)

Transition RF de MMIC à guide d'ondes et méthode associée

Publication

EP 1077502 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202837 A

Priority

US 37582499 A

Abstract (en)

An RF transition for coupling energy propagating in a waveguide transmission line into energy propagating in a monolithic microwave integrated circuit ("MMIC") is provided. The RF transition comprises a microstrip structure that includes a MMIC substrate with backside metallization and a front side microstrip. The backside metallization defines an iris, and the microstrip includes a microstrip feed formed proximate the iris. The RF transition also includes a waveguide terminating at the metallization layer around the iris to thereby convert energy propagating in the waveguide into energy propagating in the microstrip. In one embodiment, RF signal processing circuitry is monolithically formed on the MMIC substrate. The invention enables a waveguide-to-MMIC transition to be constructed at higher RF frequencies, such as millimeter wave frequencies, even with the fragile, thinner substrates and smaller device features of higher-frequency devices. The monolithic structure avoids the use of wire bonds or ribbon welds to interconnect separate substrates, such as would be used in an MIC implementation, enabling improved RF performance at higher RF frequencies. The invention enables an RF circuit to be constructed that is adapted to communicate signals with a waveguide at higher RF frequencies, such as millimeter wave frequencies, in a rugged, producible package. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 5/107

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/12 (2006.01); H01L 23/14 (2006.01); H01P 5/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077502 A2 20010221; EP 1077502 A3 20020313; CA 2312128 A1 20010216; CN 1192453 C 20050309; CN 1284761 A 20010221; JP 2001085912 A 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061019

2002-12-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB SE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI