Global Patent Index - EP 1077503 A3

EP 1077503 A3 2002-09-11 - Combined rod- and planar antenna

Title (en)

Combined rod- and planar antenna

Title (de)

Kombinierte Stab- und Planarantenne

Title (fr)

Combinaison d' une antenne fouet et d' une antenne plane

Publication

EP 1077503 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00115258 A

Priority

DE 19939321 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1077503A2] The antenna has an antenna rod (11) for transmitting and/or receiving radio signals in a radio frequency range and a planar antenna (40) for transmitting and/or receiving satellite signals. The rod is connected to a first foot part (13) on the outside of a plate (14) with a first contact part (18). A second foot part (15) on the inside of the plate has a second contact part (27). Radio signals are coupled between the contact parts via the plate. The planar antenna is mounted on the second foot part.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/12; H01Q 1/08; H01Q 21/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/32 (2006.01); H01Q 1/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/084 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1285 (2013.01); H01Q 21/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077503 A2 20010221; EP 1077503 A3 20020911; DE 19939321 A1 20010405; KR 100776191 B1 20071116; KR 20010021347 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110131

2008-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080627

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030311

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI