Global Patent Index - EP 1077508 A2

EP 1077508 A2 2001-02-21 - Indoor antenna with changeable antenna characteristics for communication with high data rates

Title (en)

Indoor antenna with changeable antenna characteristics for communication with high data rates

Title (de)

Innenraum-Antenne mit änderbarer Antennencharakteristik für die Kommunikation mit hohen Datenraten

Title (fr)

Antenne intérieure à caractéristique d' antenne variable pour la communication avec débit de données élevé

Publication

EP 1077508 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116905 A

Priority

DE 19938643 A

Abstract (en)

The antenna has drivable radiating antenna elements mounted on a base body. The base body (G) is in the form of a truncated cylinder (Z) with a polyhedron (K) mounted on it, whereby each surface of the polyhedron has an antenna element (E1,E2,E5). An Independent claim is also included for a method of operating an antenna.

Abstract (de)

Eine Antenne zur Kommunikation zwischen einer Basisstation und i.a. mehreren Terminals, insbesondere für den Innenraum, weist auf einem Grundkörper angeordnete ansteuerbare strahlende Antennenelemente auf, wobei der Grundkörper die Form eines Zylinderstumpfes mit aufgesetztem Polyeder hat, und jede Fläche des Polyeder ein Antennenelement aufweist. Insbesondere wird der Polyeder durch einen Kegelstumpf, der einer Anzahl abgeflachter Seiten aufweist, gebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 21/20; H01Q 1/00; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 1/38; H01Q 3/24; H01Q 21/29; H01Q 23/00; H04B 7/26; H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/00 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 3/24 (2006.01); H01Q 21/20 (2006.01); H01Q 21/29 (2006.01); H01Q 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/38 (2013.01); H01Q 1/007 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01); H01Q 3/242 (2013.01); H01Q 21/205 (2013.01); H01Q 21/29 (2013.01); H01Q 23/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077508 A2 20010221; EP 1077508 A3 20031112; DE 19938643 A1 20010322

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20081204

2004-08-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2004-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040512

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-11-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI