Global Patent Index - EP 1077525 A2

EP 1077525 A2 2001-02-21 - Phase synchronization of redundant motor windings

Title (en)

Phase synchronization of redundant motor windings

Title (de)

Phasensynchronisation von redundanten Motorwindungen

Title (fr)

Synchronisation de phase des enroulements redondants de moteur

Publication

EP 1077525 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00116056 A

Priority

US 37582199 A

Abstract (en)

A method and system (10) for simultaneous operation of primary (14A-14D) and redundant (16A-16D) motor windings in a redundant stepper motor (12). The redundant motor system (10) has a control circuit (11) including a phase synchronizer (36) for establishing a relationship between predetermined primary and redundant motor windings (14A-14D, 16A-16D) such that the power consumption is increased and the motor torque is affected. In one embodiment of the present invention the predetermined motor windings (14A-14D, 16A-16D) are operated in phase thereby doubling the power consumption and increasing the torque. In another embodiment, the predetermined motor windings (14A-14D, 16A-16D) are operated in phase quadrature thereby doubling the power consumption and increasing the torque by less than 50%. In yet another embodiment, the predetermined motor windings (14A-14D, 16A-16D) are operated out of phase with each other thereby doubling power consumption and producing zero torque. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02P 8/36; H02K 16/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02P 8/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02P 8/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6118246 A 20000912; DE 60034189 D1 20070516; DE 60034189 T2 20071220; EP 1077525 A2 20010221; EP 1077525 A3 20040121; EP 1077525 B1 20070404

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080107

2007-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60034189 P 20070516

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040709

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 02P 8/36 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 02K 16/04 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI