Global Patent Index - EP 1077590 A2

EP 1077590 A2 2001-02-21 - High voltage starting module

Title (en)

High voltage starting module

Title (de)

Hochspannungszündmodul

Title (fr)

Module d' amorçage haute tension

Publication

EP 1077590 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117030 A

Priority

DE 19939310 A

Abstract (en)

The module has an ignition transformer (2) in the form of a ring core transformer and a noise suppression choke (3) mounted concentrically inside the ring core transformer. The choke is fixed by a holding tube (4) on which is mounted a high voltage side connection contact (5) for the module.

Abstract (de)

Ein Hochspannungszündmodul (1) mit einem als Ringkerntransformator (2) ausgebildeten Zündtransformator weist eine Entstördrossel (3) auf, die innerhalb des Ringkerntransformators (2) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1077590 A2 20010221; EP 1077590 A3 20011212; DE 19939310 A1 20010308; DE 19939310 C2 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020527

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/04 A, 7H 05B 41/292 B

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI